Sergey *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Officer | 15.12.2012 - 13.07.2013 | ***** | General Cargo | 6100 | — | Russia | ***** | — | |
Chief Officer | 25.09.2011 - 25.02.2012 | ***** | General Cargo | 6100 | — | Combodia | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 12.11.2010 - 20.07.2011 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3600 | — | Combodia | ***** | — | |
Chief Officer | 29.09.2009 - 15.04.2010 | ***** | General Cargo | 5800 | — | Russia | ***** | — |