Sergiy *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Engineer | 17.11.2011 - 01.05.2012 | ***** | General Cargo | 32586 | Sulzer 7RND68M | 12600 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 25.01.2011 - 05.07.2011 | ***** | General Cargo | 6030 | Hanshin 6LF-58 | 6000 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 01.03.2011 - 01.09.2010 | ***** | General Cargo | 6030 | Hanshin 6LF-58 | 6000 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 01.11.2009 - 01.02.2010 | ***** | General Cargo | 7257 | MAN R7V40/54 | 5200 | Bermuda | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 01.07.2009 - 01.10.2009 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 37870 | Sulzer 6RND68 | 9900 | Malta | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 01.11.2008 - 01.04.2009 | ***** | General Cargo | 27600 | B&W 6L67GFC | 11200 | St.Vincent | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 01.02.2008 - 01.02.2008 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 37870 | Sulzer 6RND68 | 9900 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 01.05.2007 - 01.10.2007 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 46370 | B&W 5L80GB | 17600 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
2nd Engineer | 01.09.2006 - 01.02.2007 | ***** | General Cargo | 7257 | MAN R7V40/54 | 5200 | Bermuda | ***** | ***** |
2nd Engineer | 01.01.2005 - 01.06.2006 | ***** | Container | 20280 | Sulzer 6RTA 62 | 13500 | Cyprus | ***** | ***** |
2nd Engineer | 01.11.2005 - 01.05.2006 | ***** | Container | 22320 | Sulzer 6 RTA 62 U | 17320 | Bermuda | ***** | ***** |
2nd Engineer | 01.01.2004 - 01.08.2004 | ***** | Container | 4880 | MAK 9M32 | 6220 | Gibraltar | ***** | ***** |
2nd Engineer | 01.03.2003 - 01.09.2003 | ***** | Container | 4880 | MAK 9M32 | 6220 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
2nd Engineer | 01.01.2002 - 01.06.2002 | ***** | Container | 4880 | MAK 9M32 | 6220 | Cyprus | ***** | ***** |