Artur *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2nd Officer | 28.03.2014 - 09.11.2014 | ***** | General Cargo | 6446 | Wartsila 6R32BC | 2048 Kwt | BELIZE | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 06.03.2013 - 26.08.2013 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3353 | SKODA | 1440 | BELIZE | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 11.06.2012 - 08.12.2012 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3568 | SKODA | 1440 | Comoros | ***** | — |
2nd Officer | 10.10.2011 - 30.04.2012 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3568 | SKODA | 1440 | Comoros | ***** | — |
2nd Officer | 24.11.2010 - 19.07.2011 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3198 | SKL | 1480 | Comoros | ***** | — |
2nd Officer | 17.09.2010 - 15.11.2010 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3135 | SKODA | 1440 | Cambodia | ***** | — |