Konstantin *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Officer | 28.10.2013 - 12.02.2014 | ***** | Container | 111000 | — | HONG KONG | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 23.05.2013 - 24.09.2013 | ***** | Container | 97511 | — | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 29.11.2012 - 07.04.2013 | ***** | Container | 67591 | — | GERMANY | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 17.05.2012 - 23.09.2012 | ***** | Container | 80551 | — | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 07.11.2011 - 07.03.2012 | ***** | Container | 13700 | — | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 20.04.2011 - 28.08.2011 | ***** | Container | 13751 | — | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 22.10.2010 - 27.02.2011 | ***** | Container | 13700 | — | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 11.11.2009 - 22.06.2010 | ***** | Container | 13700 | — | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 05.04.2009 - 03.09.2009 | ***** | Container | 11816 | — | MARSHALL ISLANDS | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 03.05.2008 - 10.11.2008 | ***** | Container | 8400 | — | UK | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 27.07.2007 - 23.01.2008 | ***** | Container | 11135 | — | UK | ***** | ***** |
Documents and further information: