Sergiy *****
international passport:Yes
General details:
Document | Number | Place of issue | Date of expiry |
---|---|---|---|
Seaman’s passport | ***** | Kherson / Ukraine | 03.10.2022 |
Tourist passport | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 06.09.2027 |
Certificates:
Type | Number | Place of issue | Date of expiry |
---|---|---|---|
Deep sea navigator / Chief Officer | ***** | Nikolaev / Ukraine | 13.11.2020 |
GMDSS General operator | ***** | Nikolaev / Ukraine | 13.11.2020 |
Basic Safety Training | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 05.10.2020 |
Proficiency in Survival craft and RB | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 05.10.2020 |
Advanced Fire Fighting | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 05.10.2020 |
Medical Care | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 05.10.2020 |
Radar Management (ARPA+Radar) | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 05.10.2020 |
Ship carrying dandr/hazard cargo | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 05.10.2020 |
Bridge Team Management | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 05.10.2020 |
ECDIS | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 05.10.2020 |
Ship Safety Officer | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 05.10.2020 |
Security Awareness Training | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 23.12.2018 |
Designated Security Duties | ***** | Odessa / Ukraine | 24.12.2018 |
Yellow Fever | ***** | Kyiv / Ukraine | 27.04.2019 |
Ship Security Officer | ***** | Nikolaev / Ukraine | 05.08.2021 |
ECDIS Tranasas Navi-Sailor 4000 | ***** | Safebridge GmbH / Hamburg / Germany | 00.00.0000 |
ECDIS Maris ECDIS 900 | ***** | Safebridge GmbH / Hamburg / Germany | 00.00.0000 |
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Officer | 11.12.2017 - 03.07.2018 | ***** | Multi-Purpose Vessel | 3817 | MAK | 2065 | Gibraltar | ***** | ***** |
3rd Officer | 12.03.2017 - 26.08.2017 | ***** | Multi-Purpose Vessel | 3200 | MAK | 2700 | Gibraltar | ***** | ***** |
3rd Officer | 11.08.2016 - 29.11.2016 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 7444 | Daihatsu | 3425 | Marshall Islands | ***** | ***** |
3rd Officer | 23.01.2016 - 07.07.2016 | ***** | Multi-Purpose Vessel | 3817 | MAK | 2065 | Gibraltar | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 25.07.2014 - 01.08.2015 | ***** | General Cargo | 3492 | DIESEL / 6L 27/5 IIIPN, SKODA | 2 x 700 | St. Kitts & Nevis | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 17.04.2013 - 10.08.2013 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3858 | DIESEL / 6CHRN 36/45, SKL | 2 x 900 | TOGO | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 30.11.2012 - 17.02.2013 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3581 | DIESEL / 6L 27/5 IIIPN, SKODA | 2 x 700 | TOGO | ***** | ***** |
3rd Officer | 21.06.2011 - 03.03.2012 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 2916 | DIESEL / 6NVD 48A-2U, SKL | 2 x 700 | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** |
3rd Officer | 17.01.2011 - 06.05.2011 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3353 | DIESEL / 6NVD 48AU, SKL | 2×660 | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** |
Ordinary Seaman | 08.08.2009 - 12.12.2009 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3125 | DIESEL / 6NVD 48AU, SKL | 2 x 660 | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** |
Deck Cadet | 12.06.2007 - 31.08.2007 | ***** | Training Ship | 304 | DIESEL / 5TD48, Zgoda - Sulzer | 2 x 1500 | UKRAINE | ***** | — |
Documents and further information: