Oleg *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Engineer | 07.06.2010 - 16.01.2011 | ***** | Tanker Crude | 11 000 | Sulzer 6ZAL48 | 4900 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 18.06.2009 - 14.12.2009 | ***** | Tanker Crude | 11 000 | Sulzer 6ZAL48 | 4900 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
Superintendent | 26.04.2009 - 18.06.2009 | ***** | Oil Product Tanker | 10 000 | Deutz 12BV540 | 6 000 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 10.03.2008 - 18.12.2008 | ***** | Oil Product Tanker | 10 000 | Deutz 12BV540 | 6 000 | Phnom Penh | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 27.07.2006 - 21.02.2007 | ***** | Oil Product Tanker | 10 000 | Deutz 12BV540 | 6 000 | Phnom Penh | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 16.02.2005 - 18.12.2005 | ***** | Crude Oil Tanker | 7 800 | Mitsubishi 6UETC | 3 800 | Phnom Penh | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 07.10.2003 - 16.05.2004 | ***** | Oil Product Tanker | 10 000 | Deutz 12BV540 | 6 000 | Kingstown | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 12.06.2002 - 18.08.2003 | ***** | Oil Product Tanker | 10 000 | Deutz 12BV540 | 6 000 | Kingstown | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 31.07.2001 - 16.12.2001 | ***** | Crude Oil Tanker | 7 600 | B&W | 5 200 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
Single Engineer | 12.01.1994 - 20.05.2000 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 4 000 | LDMB-9 | 1 600 | Germany,Sent Johns | ***** | ***** |