Oleg *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Master | 27.05.2015 - 01.09.2015 | ***** | Chemical Tanker | 23500 | — | Singapore | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 19.07.2012 - 12.02.2013 | ***** | Oil Chemical Tanker | 13000 | — | Marshal | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 01.09.2011 - 14.03.2012 | ***** | Oil Chemical Tanker | 17800 | — | Marshal Isl | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 30.10.2010 - 10.05.2011 | ***** | Oil Chemical Tanker | 11660 | — | Panama | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 18.03.2010 - 16.08.2010 | ***** | Oil Chemical Tanker | 11571 | — | Hong Kong | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 02.10.2009 - 21.01.2010 | ***** | Oil Chemical Tanker | 10955 | — | Gibr | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 26.01.2009 - 02.08.2009 | ***** | 10133 | — | Norway | ***** | ***** | ||
2nd Officer | 26.09.2008 - 17.11.2008 | ***** | Oil Chemical Tanker | 10133 | — | Norway | ***** | ***** |
Documents and further information: