Boris *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Engineer | 17.10.2012 - 08.03.2013 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 30611 | MAN BW | 8600 | Bahamas | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 08.12.2011 - 06.05.2012 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 30611 | MAN BW | 8600 | Bahamas | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 27.01.2011 - 11.06.2011 | ***** | Container | 29912 GRT | Sulzer | 16440 | Liberia | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 21.04.2010 - 26.09.2010 | ***** | Container | 10896 GRT | MAN BW | 9730 | Liberia | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 02.07.2009 - 18.10.2009 | ***** | General Cargo | 15670 GRT | MAN BW | 8562 | Malta | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 13.01.2009 - 11.03.2009 | ***** | Reefer | 3538 GRT | MAK | 3000 | ATG | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 01.10.2008 - 02.12.2008 | ***** | Reefer | 3538 GRT | MAK | 3000 | ATG | ***** | ***** |
Chief Engineer | 10.07.2007 - 05.03.2008 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 39035 GRT | MAN BW | 11 044 | Bahamas | ***** | ***** |
Documents and further information: