Sergiy *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Officer | 16.01.2013 - 22.08.2014 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 31254 | - | - | Marshall Islands | ***** | ***** |
Chief Officer | 14.11.2011 - 12.07.2012 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 31117 | Man B&W | - | Marshall Islands | ***** | ***** |
Chief Officer | 22.10.2010 - 08.06.2011 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 31117 | Man B&W | — | Marshall Islands | ***** | ***** |