Nikolay *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Officer | 01.10.2008 - 28.04.2009 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 28136 | — | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 10.10.2007 - 17.06.2008 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 27554 | — | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 10.10.2006 - 17.06.2007 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 26398 | — | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 25.11.2005 - 26.06.2006 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 27554 | — | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 07.01.2005 - 19.08.2005 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 22904 | — | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 14.07.2003 - 02.07.2004 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 27554 | — | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 12.10.2002 - 26.04.2003 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 28136 | — | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** |