Igor *****
international passport:Yes
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2nd Officer | 02.12.2018 - 27.05.2019 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 58500 | — | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 03.03.2018 - 03.09.2018 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 57500 | — | MALTA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 11.07.2017 - 17.11.2017 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 58500 | — | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 19.07.2016 - 02.03.2017 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 58500 | — | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 13.09.2015 - 31.03.2016 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 58500 | — | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 31.10.2014 - 14.05.2015 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 57500 | — | MALTA | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 20.03.2014 - 05.09.2014 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 57500 | — | MALTA | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 08.06.2013 - 15.11.2013 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 73000 | — | MARSHAL ISLAND | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 20.08.2012 - 30.03.2013 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 73000 | — | ISLE OF MAN | ***** | ***** |