Yevgen *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4th Engineer | 24.08.2009 - 14.02.2010 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 38100 | Sulzer | 14250 | Liberia | ***** | ***** |
4th Engineer | 13.05.2008 - 09.01.2009 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 38100 | Sulzer | 14250 | Liberia | ***** | ***** |
4th Engineer | 12.02.2007 - 23.11.2007 | ***** | 6394 | Pielstik | 2*3500 | UKR | ***** | ***** | |
Motorman 1st class | 14.12.2005 - 16.09.2006 | ***** | 6394 | Pielstik | 2*3500 | UKR | ***** | ***** |