Oleksandr *****
international passport:Yes
General details:
Document | Number | Place of issue | Date of expiry |
---|---|---|---|
Civil passport | ***** | Ukraine | 00.00.0000 |
Seaman’s passport | ***** | Ukraine | 05.08.2024 |
Tourist passport | ***** | Ukraine | 12.06.2027 |
Certificates:
Type | Number | Place of issue | Date of expiry |
---|---|---|---|
Training of candidates for confirmation of a general diploma of GMDSS operator | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
SSO | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
RADAR,ARPA | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
Proficiency in survival craft and rescue boats other than fast rescue boats | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
Medical first aid on board ship | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
Medical care on board ship | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
ECDIS | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
Carrying dangerous and hazardous substaces | ***** | Ukraine | 03.04.2028 |
Bridge resource management | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
Safety familiarization,basic training and instruction for all seafarers | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
Advanced fire fighting | ***** | Ukraine | 28.03.2028 |
Deep sea navigator | ***** | Ukraine | 00.00.0000 |
Deep sea navigator endorsement | ***** | Ukraine | 03.04.2028 |
GMDSS operator | ***** | Ukraine | 00.00.0000 |
GMDSS operator endorsement | ***** | Ukraine | 03.04.2028 |
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Officer | 01.02.2022 - 28.06.2022 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 77053 | 9319 | Liberia | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 24.04.2021 - 24.10.2021 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 18319 | 5640 | Liberia | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 07.07.2020 - 18.12.2020 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 18172 | 5640 | Liberia | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 25.09.2019 - 04.02.2020 | ***** | General Cargo | 10325 | 4320 | Antigua and Barbuda | ***** | — | |
Chief Officer | 18.10.2018 - 29.03.2019 | ***** | General Cargo | 10325 | 4320 | Antigua and Barbuda | ***** | — | |
Chief Officer | 21.07.2017 - 28.05.2018 | ***** | General Cargo | 3857 | 1691 | Panama | ***** | — |