Stanislav *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Master | 11.12.2009 - 17.07.2012 | ***** | 588 kWt | — | Молдова | ***** | ***** | ||
Chief Officer | 02.08.2007 - 19.10.2009 | ***** | — | Молдова | ***** | — | |||
2nd Officer | 12.08.2005 - 24.07.2007 | ***** | Dry Cargo | — | Молдова | ***** | — | ||
Able Seaman | 17.11.2002 - 22.03.2004 | ***** | Dry Cargo | — | Грузия/ 2004 Сербия | ***** | — |