Anton *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Officer | 03.04.2013 - 01.08.2013 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3387 | — | UKR | ***** | — | |
2nd Officer | 16.01.2012 - 02.04.2013 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 3387 | — | UKR | ***** | — | |
3rd Officer | 24.11.2009 - 01.04.2010 | ***** | Dry Cargo | — | UKR | ***** | — |