Sergiy *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Officer | 20.10.2013 - 03.04.2014 | ***** | Multi-Purpose Vessel | 2375 | — | Ant Barb | ***** | — | |
Chief Officer | 15.05.2013 - 19.07.2013 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 4050 | — | Ukraine | ***** | — | |
2nd Officer | 13.11.2012 - 28.04.2013 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 61000 | — | MALTA | ***** | — | |
2nd Officer | 10.01.2012 - 01.08.2012 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 61000 | — | MALTA | ***** | — | |
2nd Officer | 22.01.2011 - 23.11.2011 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 28050 | — | MALTA | ***** | — | |
3rd Officer | 11.05.2010 - 06.12.2010 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 45621 | — | MALTA | ***** | — | |
2nd Officer | 19.02.2009 - 01.08.2009 | ***** | General Cargo | 3000 | — | ST.KITTS & NEVIS | ***** | — | |
3rd Officer | 18.02.2008 - 25.09.2008 | ***** | General Cargo | 5600 | — | UKRAINE | ***** | — |