Vladyslav *****
international passport:Yes
General details:
Document | Number | Place of issue | Date of expiry |
---|---|---|---|
Civil passport | ***** | KHERSON | unlimited |
Seaman’s passport | ***** | KHERSON | 30.03.2029 |
Tourist passport | ***** | 6512 | 14.02.2029 |
Certificates:
Type | Number | Place of issue | Date of expiry |
---|---|---|---|
MEDICAL FIRST AID | ***** | MPS | 05.08.2025 |
PROFICIENCY IN SURVIVAL CRAFT AND RESCUE BOATS | ***** | BSTC | 31.07.2025 |
ADVANCED FIRE FIGHTING | ***** | BSTC | 31.07.2025 |
RADAR NAVIGATION | ***** | IMTC | 12.05.2026 |
SHIP SECURITY OFFICER | ***** | MPS | 05.08.2025 |
SAFETY FAMILIARIZATION | ***** | BSTC | 31.07.2025 |
DANGEROUS GOODS | ***** | NCTS | 11.08.2025 |
ECDIS | ***** | NCTS | 11.08.2025 |
BRIDGE TEAM | ***** | MPS | 12.05.2026 |
BASIC TRAINING OIL AND CHEMICAL TANKER | ***** | SEAFARERS TRAINING CENTRE | 11.03.2024 |
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2nd Officer | 14.10.2023 - 11.03.2024 | ***** | Container | 22914 | — | MALTA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 26.01.2023 - 24.05.2023 | ***** | Container | 17594 | — | MALTA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 21.04.2022 - 08.11.2022 | ***** | Container | 95680 | — | MALTA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 19.08.2021 - 12.12.2021 | ***** | Container | 151446 | — | Malta | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 17.10.2020 - 07.04.2021 | ***** | Container | 40827 | 31640 | — | BAHAMAS | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 16.01.2020 - 18.06.2020 | ***** | Container | 26833 | — | MONROVIA | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 13.06.2019 - 25.09.2019 | ***** | Container | 16324 | — | LIMASSOL | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 10.09.2018 - 01.02.2019 | ***** | Container | 79702 | — | Singapore | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 15.01.2018 - 06.06.2018 | ***** | Container | 94193 | — | HKG | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 04.07.2017 - 21.09.2017 | ***** | Container | 79702 | — | Singapore | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 27.04.2017 - 02.07.2017 | ***** | Container | 94193 | — | HKG | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 04.06.2016 - 11.11.2016 | ***** | Container | 66058 | — | Liberia | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 22.08.2015 - 25.01.2016 | ***** | Container | 14308 | 14832 | PORTUGAL | ***** | ***** |