Denys *****
international passport:No
General details:
Document | Number | Place of issue | Date of expiry |
---|---|---|---|
Civil passport | ***** | UKRAINE | 00.00.0000 |
Seaman’s passport | ***** | port Mariupol | 06.08.2014 |
Tourist passport | ***** | Mariupol | 12.04.2017 |
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Master | 26.06.2020 - 07.11.2020 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 77650 | — | Marshal island | ***** | ***** | |
Master | 20.04.2019 - 20.11.2019 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 75574 | SULZER | 12700 | MARSHAL ISLAND | ***** | ***** |
Master | 29.05.2018 - 09.10.2018 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 77663 | B&W | — | MARSHAL ISLANDS | ***** | — |
Master | 25.09.2017 - 25.03.2018 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 41450 | SULZER | — | PANAMA | ***** | — |
Master | 26.10.2016 - 02.05.2017 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 41450 | SULZER | — | PANAMA | ***** | — |
Chief Officer | 05.01.2016 - 26.05.2016 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 41450 | — | ***** | — | ||
Chief Officer | 15.01.2015 - 11.12.2014 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 41450 | SULZER | — | PANAMA | ***** | ***** |
Chief Officer | 15.07.2014 - 07.11.2014 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | — | ***** | — | |||
Chief Officer | 20.05.2013 - 09.04.2014 | ***** | General Cargo | 6226 | SKL | 4970 | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 12.06.2010 - 20.10.2010 | ***** | General Cargo | 6226 | SKL | — | UKRAINE | ***** | ***** |