Roman *****
international passport:Yes
COC & Endorsment:
Document | Qualification | Country | Date of expiry | Number |
---|---|---|---|---|
Certificate of competency | Chief Officer | Ukraine | 27.06.2027 | ***** |
COC Endorsment | 2 | Ukraine | 27.06.2027 | ***** |
General details:
Document | Number | Place of issue | Date of expiry |
---|---|---|---|
Civil passport | ***** | Skadovsk | unlimited |
Seaman’s passport | ***** | Szczecin, Poland | 22.03.2029 |
Tourist passport | ***** | Kherson | 04.01.2029 |
Certificates:
Type | Number | Place of issue | Date of expiry |
---|---|---|---|
G.M.D.S.S. | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 27.06.2027 |
Chief Mate | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 27.06.2027 |
Bridge Team and Resource Management | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 18.01.2027 |
ECDIS | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 18.01.2027 |
Medical Care on Board | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 18.01.2027 |
Advanced Fire Fighting | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 18.01.2027 |
Ship Security Officer (SSO) | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 18.01.2027 |
Medical First Aid | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 18.01.2027 |
RADAR NAVIGATION-MANAGEMENT LEVEL (RADAR, ARPA, BRIDGE TEAMWORK AND SEARCH AND RESCUE) | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 18.01.2027 |
Safety Familarization,Basic Training and Instruction for All Seafarers | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 18.01.2027 |
A VI/2 Proficiency in survival craft and rescue boats other than fast rescue boats | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 18.01.2027 |
Carriage of Dangerous and Hazardous Substances | ***** | Marine Pro Service | 19.07.2027 |
FURUNO ECDIS | ***** | FURUNO ELECTRIC CO., LTD | 19.05.2033 |
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2nd Officer | 02.06.2023 - 19.02.2024 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 16648 | — | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 29.07.2022 - 10.02.2023 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 13000 | 3000 | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 08.04.2021 - 28.09.2021 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 15800 | MAN-B&W | 3824 | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 05.05.2020 - 12.10.2020 | ***** | General Cargo | 14000 | B&W | 3824 | Luxembourg | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 04.06.2019 - 01.12.2019 | ***** | General Cargo | 14000 | B&W | 3824 | Luxembourg | ***** | ***** |
2nd Officer | 12.07.2018 - 24.11.2018 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 12556 | 4050 | Malta | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 06.06.2017 - 02.11.2017 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 12556 | 4050 | Malta | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 05.06.2016 - 09.12.2016 | ***** | General Cargo | 11560 | 5400 | Malta | ***** | ***** | |
2nd Officer | 08.09.2015 - 04.03.2016 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 12356 | 3850 | Malta | ***** | ***** | |
3rd Officer | 18.11.2014 - 20.03.2015 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 29942 | 5970 | Malta | ***** | ***** |