Oleksandr *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3rd Engineer | 27.06.2011 - 02.12.2011 | ***** | Chemical Tanker | 3541 | HANSHIN, LH36LA | 2660 | Malta | ***** | ***** |
Motorman 1st class | 07.08.2009 - 03.01.2010 | ***** | Gas Tanker | 18270 | B&W MITSUI 6L67 GFCA | 13100 | UK | ***** | ***** |
Motorman 1st class | 19.01.2009 - 03.06.2009 | ***** | Chemical Tanker | 23404 | Sulzer 3ELB9 | 10239 | Panama | ***** | ***** |
Motorman 1st class | 28.03.2008 - 11.09.2008 | ***** | Gas Tanker | 18270 | B&W MITSUI 6L67 GFCA | 13100 | UK | ***** | ***** |
Motorman 1st class | 24.05.2007 - 14.11.2007 | ***** | Gas Tanker | 18270 | B&W MITSUI 6L67 GFCA | 13100 | UK | ***** | ***** |
Motorman 1st class | 09.07.2006 - 10.01.2007 | ***** | Gas Tanker | 18270 | B&W MITSUI 6L67 GFCA | 13100 | UK | ***** | ***** |
Motorman 1st class | 21.09.2005 - 13.03.2006 | ***** | Gas Tanker | 13453 | IHI-SULZER,4 RTA-52 | 6000 | Liberia | ***** | ***** |
Motorman 1st class | 22.03.2005 - 11.05.2005 | ***** | Gas Tanker | 18270 | B&W MITSUI 6L67 GFCA | 13100 | UK | ***** | ***** |
Motorman 1st class | 19.04.2004 - 11.10.2004 | ***** | Gas Tanker | 18270 | B&W MITSUI 6L67 GFCA | 13100 | UK | ***** | ***** |