Gennadiy *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Engineer | 08.06.2012 - 28.09.2012 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 55536 | Man B&W 6S50MC-C | 11010 | LIBERIA | ***** | — |
Chief Engineer | 16.11.2011 - 05.02.2012 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 26400 | MAN B&W 5L50MC | 10000 | LIBERIA | ***** | — |
Chief Engineer | 07.01.2011 - 17.05.2011 | ***** | Container | 15312 | SULZER 8RTA62U | 24160 | MARSHALL ISLANDS | ***** | — |
Chief Engineer | 05.03.2010 - 13.08.2010 | ***** | Container | 14080 | MAN B&W 6L50MC | 9300 | MARSHALL ISLANDS | ***** | — |
Chief Engineer | 24.01.2009 - 23.06.2009 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 75100 | MAN B&W 5S60MC | 13900 | LIBERIA | ***** | — |
Chief Engineer | 22.05.2008 - 05.10.2008 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 170578 | MAN B&W 6S70MC | 22926 | LIBERIA | ***** | — |
Chief Engineer | 15.09.2007 - 23.08.2008 | ***** | Car Carrier | 21053 | MAN B&W 7S60MC-C | 21214 | BAHAMAS | ***** | — |