Viktor *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Officer | 11.02.2015 - 05.08.2015 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 73000 | — | MARSHALL ISLANDS | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 11.03.2014 - 11.09.2014 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 73000 | — | MARSHALL ISLANDS | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 22.08.2013 - 13.11.2013 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 73000 | — | MARSHALL ISLANDS | ***** | ***** | |
Master | 26.06.2013 - 22.08.2013 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 73000 | — | MARSHALL ISLANDS | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 28.05.2013 - 26.06.2013 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 73000 | — | MARSHALL ISLANDS | ***** | ***** | |
Master | 14.04.2012 - 29.11.2012 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 7057 | — | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
Master | 09.03.2011 - 03.10.2011 | ***** | Dry Cargo | 7057 | — | LIBERIA | ***** | ***** | |
Master | 11.07.2010 - 13.11.2010 | ***** | Coaster | 3500 | — | BAHAMAS | ***** | ***** |