Oleksandr *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Master | 04.07.2011 - 04.12.2011 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 79800 MT | FLEX | 14500 BHP | ANTIGUA | ***** | ***** |
Master | 14.09.2010 - 09.04.2011 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 47800 MT | PIELSTIC | 12800 | MARSHALL ISLAND | ***** | ***** |
Master | 27.05.2009 - 25.03.2010 | ***** | General Cargo | 15050 MT | 5600 | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** | |
Master | 14.06.2008 - 09.01.2009 | ***** | General Cargo | 15050 MT | 5600 | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** | |
Master | 05.08.2007 - 06.03.2008 | ***** | General Cargo | 15050 | 5600 | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** | |
Master | 23.06.2006 - 21.03.2007 | ***** | General Cargo | 15050 | 5600 | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** | |
Master | 29.06.2005 - 15.02.2006 | ***** | General Cargo | 15050 MT | 5600 | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** | |
Chief Officer | 25.11.2004 - 29.05.2005 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 170000 MT | B&W | 19480 | CYPRUS | ***** | ***** |
Chief Officer | 07.11.2003 - 17.06.2004 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 72000 MT | B&W | 12064 BHP | PANAMA | ***** | ***** |
Chief Officer | 23.04.2002 - 28.04.2003 | ***** | Bulk Carrier | 45000 MT | 12060 | PANAMA | ***** | ***** |
Documents and further information: