Evgeniy *****
international passport:Not specified
Sea service:
Position | From / To | Vessel name | Vessel type | DWT | ME | BHP | Flag | Shipowner | Crewing |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Engineer | 23.09.2011 - 13.02.2012 | ***** | General Cargo | MaK M453AK | — | Россия | ***** | — | |
Chief Engineer | 10.01.2011 - 25.05.2011 | ***** | General Cargo | MaK M453AK | — | Россия | ***** | — | |
Chief Engineer | 05.08.2010 - 20.11.2010 | ***** | General Cargo | MaK M453AK | — | Россия | ***** | — | |
Chief Engineer | 11.02.2010 - 11.06.2010 | ***** | General Cargo | MaK M453AK | — | Россия | ***** | — | |
2nd Engineer | 10.09.2009 - 25.12.2009 | ***** | Dry Cargo | MAN K8Z 70/120E | — | Россия | ***** | — | |
2nd Engineer | 08.05.2009 - 31.07.2009 | ***** | Tank-Cleaning Vessel | HITACHI B&W L35MC | — | Россия | ***** | — | |
Chief Engineer | 17.07.2008 - 27.02.2009 | ***** | General Cargo | 2 x 6NVD 48A-2U | — | Россия | ***** | — | |
Chief Engineer | 18.01.2008 - 10.05.2008 | ***** | General Cargo | B&W 5VT2BF110 | — | PHNOM PENH | ***** | — | |
Chief Engineer | 06.09.2007 - 10.01.2008 | ***** | General Cargo | B&W 550 VTBF- 110 | — | PHNOM PENH | ***** | — |